Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/31/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/31/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/01/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/01/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/01/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/01/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/09/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/17/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/30/2008