Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/14/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/14/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/31/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/01/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/17/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/31/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/31/2008