Text: H.Res.1063 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (06/10/2008)


H. Res. 1063



In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

June 10, 2008.  

    Whereas the United States will celebrate this year the 225th anniversary of its relationship with the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland since the September 3, 1783 signing of the Treaty of Paris, which formally ended the American Revolutionary War between the Kingdom of Great Britain and the United States of America;

    Whereas both the United Kingdom and the United States are free and democratic nations with a common commitment to human rights and the rule of law;

    Whereas the United Kingdom is a major ally of the United States and 2008 marks the 50th anniversary of the US-UK Mutual Defense Agreement that was signed in Washington, DC, on July 3, 1958, and renewed in Washington, DC, on June 14, 2004;

    Whereas both the United Kingdom and the United States are founding members of the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO), having been party to the North Atlantic Treaty signed in Washington, DC, on April 4, 1949;

    Whereas the United Kingdom is a major partner in the worldwide fight against terrorism, supporting the United States in many key armed struggles;

    Whereas the United Kingdom is the second largest contributor to the multinational force in Iraq;

    Whereas the United Kingdom plays a significant role in the military effort to bring lasting stability to Afghanistan and is the second largest contributor to NATO’s International Security Assistance Force;

    Whereas the United Kingdom and the United States share a steadfast alliance and a long tradition of opposing extremism, which included fighting the forces of nazism and communism in the 20th century;

    Whereas the United Kingdom is the sixth largest trading partner of the United States, and the United States is the largest trading partner of the United Kingdom;

    Whereas the United States and the United Kingdom share the world’s largest foreign direct investment partnership, with American investment sustaining over a million jobs in the United Kingdom and British investment sustaining over a million jobs in the United States;

    Whereas approximately 675,000 British citizens reside in the United States, and 155,000 Americans reside in the United Kingdom, with both communities contributing to the fabric of life in their host countries;

    Whereas approximately 8,400 British students are currently studying at universities in the United States, and 32,000 American students are studying at universities in the United Kingdom; and

    Whereas the relationship between the United States and the United Kingdom is one of unity and strength, and has been proven to be of mutual benefit: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) marks the 225th anniversary of relations between the United States and the Kingdom of Great Britain;

(2) recognizes that the Kingdom of Great Britain’s recognition of the United States was an important event in the history of the Nation;

(3) reaffirms the value of the deep friendship that has developed between our two Countries since the signing of the Treaty of Paris; and

(4) looks forward to a continued and strengthened relationship between the British and American people.

Attest:





Clerk.  


Share This