Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/02/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/29/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/05/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/30/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/08/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/11/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/16/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/16/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/16/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/23/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/09/2008