There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the 50th anniversary of the crossing of the North Pole by the USS Nautilus (SSN 571) and its significance in the history of both our Nation and the world.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/14/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 0 (Roll no. 486).(text: CR H6419)
04/01/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/14/2008-6:59pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 0 (Roll no. 486). (text: CR H6419)
07/14/2008-6:59pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/14/2008-6:33pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6446-6447)
07/14/2008-2:49pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/14/2008-2:39pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1067.
07/14/2008-2:39pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6419-6421)
07/14/2008-2:39pmMr. Courtney moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/18/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Expeditionary Forces.
04/01/2008Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
04/01/2008Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/01/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/01/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/06/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/22/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/01/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Seapower and Expeditionary Forces04/18/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1067. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/14/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes the historic significance of the journey to, and successful crossing of, the North Pole by the USS Nautilus.

Commends its officers and crew on the 50th anniversary of such achievement.

Recognizes the Nautilus's journey as not only a military and scientific accomplishment, but also in confirming America's long-standing interest in that vital region.

Commends the role of the Nautilus and the U.S. submarine force in protecting the interests of the free world during the Cold War.

Supports the continuing role of the U.S. submarine force in defending our country in the 21st century.