Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/03/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/17/2008