Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/02/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/22/2008