Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/09/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/09/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/09/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/10/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/10/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/10/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/14/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/14/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/14/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/14/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/16/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/16/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/17/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/17/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/17/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/24/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/29/2008