Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/03/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/10/2008