Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/08/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/10/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/10/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/10/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/22/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/22/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/22/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/29/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/29/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/29/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/29/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/30/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/30/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/30/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/30/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/05/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/07/2008