Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/09/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/10/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/10/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/10/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2008