Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/23/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/23/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/24/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/13/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/22/2008