Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/14/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/24/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/24/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/24/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/24/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/24/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/01/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/01/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/01/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/06/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/06/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/06/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/20/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/21/2008