Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/16/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/16/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/16/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/16/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/16/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/16/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/16/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/16/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/16/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/16/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/16/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/16/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/16/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/16/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/16/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/16/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/16/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/16/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/16/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/16/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/16/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/16/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/16/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/16/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/16/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/29/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/05/2008