There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning Hamas as a foreign terrorist organization responsible for the murders of 26 United States citizens.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/16/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/16/2008Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/16/2008Introduced in House

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/16/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/17/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/17/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/17/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/22/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/18/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/16/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1110.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1110. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/16/2008)

Condemns Hamas as a foreign terrorist organization responsible for the murders of 26 U.S. citizens.

Calls on Hamas to renounce terrorism and recognize Israel’s right to exist as a Jewish state.

Reaffirms support for Israel’s right to defend her citizens against Hamas terrorism.