Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/16/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/16/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/17/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/17/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/17/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/22/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/22/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/18/2008