Text: H.Res.1110 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/16/2008)


110th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. RES. 1110


Condemning Hamas as a foreign terrorist organization responsible for the murders of 26 United States citizens.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

April 16, 2008

Mr. Kirk (for himself, Ms. Berkley, Mr. Boehner, Mr. Blunt, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, Mr. Cantor, Mr. McCotter, Mr. Engel, Mr. Shuster, Mr. Burton of Indiana, Mr. Weiner, Mr. Franks of Arizona, Mr. Souder, Mr. Kagen, Mr. Fortuño, Mr. Wilson of South Carolina, Mrs. Gillibrand, Mr. Fossella, Mr. LoBiondo, Mr. McNulty, Mr. Kuhl of New York, Mrs. Miller of Michigan, Mr. Shays, Mr. Burgess, Mr. Gerlach, Mr. Porter, Mr. Ramstad, and Mr. Poe) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Condemning Hamas as a foreign terrorist organization responsible for the murders of 26 United States citizens.

    Whereas former President Jimmy Carter will travel to Syria to meet with Khaled Mashaal, the leader of the Hamas terrorist organization;

    Whereas both President Bill Clinton and President George W. Bush’s administrations designated Hamas as a foreign terrorist organization;

    Whereas Hamas terrorists are responsible for the murders of at least 26 United States citizens, including teenagers, children, and infants;

    Whereas, on December 1, 1993, Hamas terrorists murdered 19-year-old Yitzhak Weinstock of California;

    Whereas on October 9, 1994, Hamas terrorists kidnapped 19-year-old Nachshon Wachsman of New York, bound, gagged, and videotaped him and later murdered him during a rescue attempt;

    Whereas, on February 25, 1996, Hamas terrorists murdered 22-year-old Sara Duker of New Jersey, her fiance, 25-year-old Matthew Eisenfeld of Connecticut, and Ira Weinstein of New York;

    Whereas, on May 13, 1996, Hamas terrorists murdered 17-year-old David Boim of New York;

    Whereas, on September 4, 1997, Hamas terrorists murdered 14-year-old Yael Botwin of California and Leah Stern of New Jersey;

    Whereas, on August 9, 2001, Hamas terrorists murdered 15-year-old Malka Roth of New York and Judith Greenbaum of New Jersey;

    Whereas, on July 32, 2002, Hamas terrorists planted a bomb targeting United States citizens attending Hebrew University in Jerusalem and murdered 24-year-old Marla Bennett of California, 25-year-old Benjamin Blutstein of Pennsylvania, 37-year-old Dina Carter of North Carolina, 36-year-old Janice Ruth Coulter of Massachusetts, and 24-year-old David Gritz of Massachusetts;

    Whereas, on May 7, 2003, Hamas terrorists murdered Rabbi Eli Horowitz of Illinois and his wife, Dina Horowitz of Florida;

    Whereas, on June 11, 2003, Hamas terrorists murdered Alan Beer of Ohio;

    Whereas, on June 20, 2003, Hamas terrorists murdered Tzvi Goldstein of New York;

    Whereas, on August 19, 2003, Hamas terrorists murdered Goldie Taubenfeld, three-month-old Shmuel Taubenfeld, three-year-old Tehilla Nathanson, nine-year-old Yitzhak Reinitz, and Mordechai Reinitz, all of New York;

    Whereas, on September 9, 2003, Hamas terrorists murdered David Applebaum of Ohio, head of the emergency room at Shaare Tzedek Medical Center in Jerusalem and founder of a network of emergency medical service clinics, and 20-year-old Nava Applebaum of Ohio, who was getting married the next day; and

    Whereas the Hamas terrorist organization denies Israel’s right to exist as a Jewish state: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) condemns Hamas as a foreign terrorist organization responsible for the murders of 26 United States citizens;

(2) calls on Hamas to renounce terrorism, fully disarm, and recognize Israel’s right to exist as a Jewish state; and

(3) reaffirms its strong support for Israel’s right to defend her citizens against Hamas terrorism.