There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing Armed Forces Day.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/27/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H10216)
09/27/2008Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
04/17/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
09/27/2008-3:49pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2008-3:49pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10216)
09/27/2008-3:49pmConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10215-10216)
09/27/2008Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
09/27/2008-3:48pmMr. Clay asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
05/01/2008Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/01/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/17/2008Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
04/17/2008Introduced in House

Cosponsors (112)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/24/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/24/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/24/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/24/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/24/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/24/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/24/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/14/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/19/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/19/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/19/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/19/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/19/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/17/2008 Referred to
05/01/2008 Markup by
09/27/2008 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1122.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1122. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/27/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes Armed Forces Day in appreciation of the members of the Army, Navy, Marine Corps, Air Force, and Coast Guard.