Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/24/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/24/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/24/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/24/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/24/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/24/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/24/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/24/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/24/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/24/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/14/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/19/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/19/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/19/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/19/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/19/2008