Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/23/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/23/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/23/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/23/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/23/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/29/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/29/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/01/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/01/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/01/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/05/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/05/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/05/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/05/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/05/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/05/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/06/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/19/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/20/2008