Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/22/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/30/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/30/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/30/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/30/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/30/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/30/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/12/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/17/2008