There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goals and ideals of Peace Officers Memorial Day.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/21/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 5/19/2008 H4081-4082)
04/22/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
05/21/2008-4:27pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2008-4:27pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 5/19/2008 H4081-4082)
05/21/2008-4:27pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4402)
05/19/2008-1:21pmAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Issa objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
05/19/2008-1:16pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1132.
05/19/2008-1:16pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4081-4083)
05/19/2008-1:16pmMs. Watson moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
05/01/2008Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/01/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/22/2008Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
04/22/2008Introduced in House

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/23/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/24/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/24/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/24/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/24/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/24/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/24/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/24/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/29/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/29/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/29/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/29/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/07/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/22/2008 Referred to
05/01/2008 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1132. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/21/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Supports the goals of Peace Officers Memorial Day to honor federal, state, and local peace officers killed or disabled in the line of duty.