Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/30/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/30/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/30/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/13/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/20/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/21/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/21/2008