Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/01/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/07/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/07/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/08/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/19/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/19/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/19/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/09/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/11/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/19/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/09/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/23/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/23/2008