Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/12/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/20/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/02/2008