Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/08/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/14/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/21/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/05/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/11/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/11/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/12/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/23/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/16/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/31/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/09/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/17/2008