Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/12/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/12/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/12/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/27/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/27/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/28/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/05/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/08/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/08/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/09/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/10/2007