Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/08/2008