Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/14/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/14/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/14/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/14/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/14/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/14/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/14/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/14/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/14/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/14/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/14/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/14/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/15/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/15/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/15/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/15/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/15/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/20/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/03/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/05/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/20/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/25/2008