Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/14/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/14/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/22/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/22/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/23/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/23/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/10/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/15/2008