Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/14/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/14/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/14/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/14/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/28/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/28/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/05/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/06/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/09/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/20/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/20/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/22/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/26/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/26/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/26/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/28/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/29/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/07/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/08/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/08/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/10/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/10/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/14/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/16/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/16/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/12/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/12/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/14/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/14/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/21/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/21/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/21/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/26/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/26/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/27/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/27/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/12/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/16/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/16/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/16/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/25/2007