Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/11/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/11/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/18/2008