Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/22/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/26/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/26/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/08/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/08/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/08/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/09/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/23/2008