Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/04/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/17/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/2008