Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/09/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/12/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/12/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/12/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/12/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/12/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/17/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/17/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/20/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/20/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/25/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/25/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/25/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/25/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/09/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/29/2008