Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/11/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/22/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/22/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/23/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/23/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/23/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/29/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/29/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/29/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/29/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/03/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/10/2008