Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/23/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/23/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/23/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/23/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/08/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/08/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/08/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/08/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/08/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/08/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/08/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/08/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/15/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/16/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/16/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/16/2008