Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/20/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/20/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/20/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/20/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/20/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/20/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/08/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/09/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/22/2008