Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 06/19/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/17/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/21/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/21/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/21/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/21/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/22/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/22/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/23/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/23/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/23/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/23/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/23/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/24/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/24/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/29/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/29/2008