Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/15/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/16/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/16/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/16/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/16/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/16/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/21/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/21/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/21/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/21/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/21/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/21/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/21/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/21/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/21/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/21/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/21/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/21/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/21/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/21/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2008