Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/22/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2008