Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/25/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/25/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/25/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/26/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/26/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/09/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/10/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/31/2008