Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/24/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/24/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/29/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/29/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/30/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/30/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/30/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/31/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/31/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/09/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/15/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/10/2008