There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the dedication and honorable service of members of the National Guard who are serving or have served in Operation Jump Start.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/16/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
06/26/2008Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
06/26/2008Introduced in House

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/09/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/10/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/16/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/26/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/16/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1306.


Subjects (20)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1306. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2008)

Unconditionally supports members of the National Guard and their families.

Recognizes: (1) the sacrifices made by such members and their families; (2) the men and women who have so served as examples of leadership, courage, and service before self; and (3) the work the National Guard has put forth to secure our southwest border.