Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/09/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/10/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/16/2008