Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/08/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/08/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/08/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/08/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/09/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/09/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/09/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/09/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/09/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/09/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/09/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/09/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/09/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/09/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/10/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/10/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/10/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/10/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/10/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/15/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/15/2008