Text: H.Res.1315 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (07/10/2008)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 1315 Engrossed in House (EH)]


                In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

                                                         July 10, 2008.
Whereas the National Aeronautics and Space Administration was established on 
        July 29, 1958;
Whereas on May 5, 1961, NASA successfully launched America's first manned 
        spacecraft, Freedom 7, piloted by Alan B. Shepard, Jr.;
Whereas in July of 1969 President John Kennedy's vision of landing a man on the 
        moon and returning him safely to Earth was realized with the Apollo 11 
        mission, commanded by Neil A. Armstrong, Lunar Module Pilot Edwin 
        ``Buzz'' Aldrin, Jr., and Command Module pilot Michael Collins;
Whereas on April 12, 1981, NASA began a new era of human space flight and 
        exploration with the launch of the first Space Shuttle Columbia, 
        commanded by John W. Young and piloted by Robert L. ``Bob'' Crippen;
Whereas NASA has greatly expanded our knowledge and understanding of our planet 
        and solar system through various unmanned vehicles utilized on numerous 
        missions;
Whereas, during the Cold War, NASA's achievements served as a source of national 
        pride and captured the imagination of the world by demonstrating a 
        peaceful use of our technological capabilities;
Whereas NASA now serves as a model for international cooperation and American 
        leadership through the International Space Station and other scientific 
        endeavors;
Whereas thanks to NASA and the far-reaching gaze of the Hubble Space Telescope, 
        we have seen further into our universe than ever before;
Whereas NASA space probes have landed on or flown by eight of the planets in our 
        solar system;
Whereas the aeronautics research by NASA has led to great discoveries and 
        advances in aircraft design and aviation;
Whereas the work done by NASA has expanded the scope of human knowledge, created 
        new technologies, and inspired young men and women to enter scientific 
        and engineering careers;
Whereas in the last fifty years, NASA has positively impacted almost every facet 
        of our lives; and
Whereas, thanks to the heroism, courage, and supreme sacrifice of our astronaut 
        corps over the last five decades, we are now able to live and work in 
        space for the benefit of all men: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) honors the men and women of the National Aeronautics and Space 
        Administration on the occasion of its 50th Anniversary;
            (2) acknowledges the value of NASA's discoveries and 
        accomplishments; and
            (3) pledges to maintain America's position as the world leader in 
        aeronautics and space exploration and technology.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.