Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/14/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/08/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/10/2008