Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/08/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/15/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/17/2008