Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/09/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/14/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/14/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/14/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/17/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/23/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/30/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 08/01/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/09/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/15/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/15/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/17/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/17/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/17/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/17/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/23/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/23/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/23/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/25/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/25/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/25/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/26/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/29/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/02/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/02/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/02/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/02/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/02/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/02/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/02/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/03/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/19/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/19/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/19/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/19/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/19/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/19/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/19/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/19/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/20/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/20/2008